Financial history NORTHAMPTON MENCAP

Charity number: 208974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £55.37k £56.19k £42.34k £41.12k £40.96k
Total expenditure £56.60k £62.78k £65.56k £52.95k £45.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.50k N/A