Governing document THE NORFOLK FREEMASONS CHARITABLE FUNDS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS 16TH OCTOBER 1943 AS AMENDED 28TH MYAY 1976, 26TH OCTOBER 1984, 25TH OCTOBER 1985, AND 22ND MAY 1992 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND/OR ADVANCE IN LIFE CHILDREN OF FREEMASONS OF THE PROVINCE OF NORFOLK, AFFORD ASSISTANCE AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS OF FREEMASONS IN THE PROVINCE OF NORFOLK, THEIR WIDOWS AND FAMILIES AND TO SUBSCRIBE TO MASONIC AND OTHER CHARITIES. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE SECTION 1 OF RULES)
Area of benefit
NORFOLK AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.