THE NEW CHURCH CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 209126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 July 2016 On time Download