THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE THEOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN ENGLAND

Charity number: 209130
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 August 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 17 August 2021 18 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 September 2019 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 12 September 2019 44 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 11 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required