THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE THEOSOPHICAL SOCIETY IN ENGLAND

Charity number: 209130
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £4.91k £4.57k £203.95k £2.51k £32.33k
Total expenditure £3.07k £2.37k £2.52k £4.14k £6.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A