SEAMEN'S CHRISTIAN FRIEND SOCIETY

Charity number: 209133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 September 2017 On time Download