SEAMEN'S CHRISTIAN FRIEND SOCIETY

Charity number: 209133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £138.80k £240.42k £178.61k £142.11k £176.50k
Total expenditure £95.22k £169.02k £115.78k £156.87k £191.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A