ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MEDWAY WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 209192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £105.11k £138.63k £129.67k £158.63k £135.10k
Total expenditure £104.03k £125.70k £122.78k £113.77k £109.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £32.16k