Financial history THE BRITISH EDITORIAL SOCIETY OF BONE AND JOINT SURGERY

Charity number: 209299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.62m £2.45m £2.59m £2.57m £2.48m
Total expenditure £2.44m £2.45m £2.74m £2.26m £2.43m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £427.23k £362.53k £390.75k £268.50k £260.79k
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.73m £1.84m £1.77m £1.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £346.47k £363.06k £356.90k £526.23k £412.70k
Income - Other £1.81k £700 £3.90k £6.64k £14.25k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.34m £2.33m £2.65m £2.16m £2.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £97.70k £118.84k £90.30k £97.37k £105.26k
Expenditure - Governance £43.65k £70.94k £44.57k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £20.53k £27.65k £15.16k £47.54k £58.46k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0