ARDELEY CHARITY ESTATES

Charity number: 209474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2019 13 November 2020 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2017 24 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2016 Not Required