ARDELEY CHARITY ESTATES

Charity number: 209474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/07/2016 01/07/2017 01/07/2018 01/07/2019 01/07/2020
Total gross income £6.41k £6.42k £6.85k £6.84k £6.97k
Total expenditure £6.91k £6.90k £7.50k £7.35k £6.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A