THE GUIDE DOGS FOR THE BLIND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 209617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £107.00m £108.70m £117.70m £122.20m £125.90m
Total expenditure £101.70m £106.70m £106.30m £113.40m £111.90m
Income from government contracts £580.65k £800.00k £824.00k £1.00m £423.63k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £415.00k £4.30m
Income - Donations and legacies £98.40m £98.10m £107.00m £108.20m £107.90m
Income - Other trading activities £6.70m £7.20m £7.30m £10.70m £11.80m
Income - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.10m £1.10m £1.40m £800.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £700.00k £800.00k £900.00k £1.00m £900.00k
Income - Other £100.00k £1.50m £1.40m £900.00k £4.50m
Income - Legacies £47.90m £43.70m £47.40m £48.10m £48.30m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £62.20m £62.20m £67.30m £75.70m £76.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £39.50m £44.50m £39.00m £37.70m £35.90m
Expenditure - Governance £700.00k £700.00k £300.00k £200.00k £200.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £200.00k £300.00k £400.00k £400.00k £200.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0