Financial history The Institute of Physics Benevolent Fund

Charity number: 209746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £27.76k £29.17k £45.52k £42.50k £44.67k
Total expenditure £30.92k £49.26k £76.58k £54.15k £45.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A