Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST MARGARETS HOSPITAL

Charity number: 210012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £13.98k £13.84k £7.61k £31.06k £6.58k
Total expenditure £8.21k £16.10k £3.18k £3.84k £4.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.25k N/A