Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST MARGARETS HOSPITAL
Charity number: 210012

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Gotting | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Wallace | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gardner | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Burrows | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jan Buckingham | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anne Munro | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE LAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LIZ JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.