THE NORMANSFIELD AND RICHMOND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 210144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 11 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 14 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 14 March 2017 On time Download