Trustees ROYAL ARTILLERY CHARITABLE FUND
Charity number: 210202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Major General David Cullen CB, OBE | Chair | 15 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Colonel Benjamin Matthew David Ingham MBE | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Colonel Richard Andrew Forster | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Colonel Christopher Lionel Coton | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||
WOI RASM Len Sanders | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Colonel Richard Charles Harmer ADC | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Colonel Darren Michael Bishop MBE VR | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Lieutenant Colonel Simon John Howe | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Mark Alexander Alford Dornan | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|||||
BRIGADIER MARK NICHOLAS POUNTAIN CBE | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Col Michael Relph MBE | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|||||
COLONEL CHRISTOPHER COMPORT OBE TD DL | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
MAJOR JAMES OLIVER LEIGHTON TD | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR ANDREW JOHN DINES TD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.