Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN ELIZABETH THE QUEEN MOTHER HOSPITAL

Charity number: 210234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SYLVIA PHEILS Chair
None on record
Hazel Ingleton Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Stephanie Walsh Trustee 01 February 2019
None on record
Jeremy Scarlett Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
TERRY LEIGH CUNARD Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Brian Whitehead Trustee 15 January 2015
MARGATE AND DR PEETE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Linda JUDD Trustee 08 January 2014
None on record
Sandra Scott Trustee 08 January 2014
None on record
AMANDA JANE VOIZEY Trustee
INNER WHEEL CLUB OF MARGATE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
NIGEL JOHN STOKES Trustee
None on record
JEREMY JOHN VOIZEY Trustee
None on record