THEATRE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 210262
Charity reporting is up to date (136 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £384.12k £362.36k £342.01k £353.20k £322.96k
Total expenditure £358.61k £351.47k £328.41k £333.85k £384.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A