ROCKLAND ST MARY FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 210399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.10k £6.89k £8.49k £10.77k £9.80k
Total expenditure £6.85k £5.50k £5.09k £3.60k £5.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.10k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A