ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS KENT NORTH WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 210633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 August 2017 On time Download