The London Rifles Volunteer Trusts

Charity number: 210638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 26/08/1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 07 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
CHATTELS TO BE HELD BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE IN THE EXISTING UNIT [THE 7TH BATTALION, THE RIFLES]
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 13 November 1962 : Standard registration