The London Rifles Volunteer Trusts

Charity number: 210638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL WHITFELD Trustee 14 May 2019
THE DARELL-BROWN, ROBIN MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
MAJOR GENERAL NICHOLAS COTTAM CB OBE Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
Lt Colonel James Baker Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
Nicholas James Springett ADDYMAN Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
Peter Howard Bull Trustee 28 February 2020 None on record
TERRY ROPER MBE TD Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record
RICHARD FROST MBE Trustee 14 May 2019 None on record
FRANCIS ROLLESTON GARDNER OBE TD Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
John William Hayter Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record
COLONEL SIDNEY ANTHONY GEORGE ABRAHAMS TD DL MBA Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
JAMES FRANCIS SHACKLETON Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
DR JOHN GRIFFITH JONES Trustee 12 October 2016 None on record
NEIL ANTONY JOHNSON OBE DL Chair 14 October 2015 None on record
RUPERT JAMES SPENCER JOHNSON TD FRICS Trustee 12 October 2016 None on record