TOWN ESTATE OR GUILDHALL CHARITY

Charity number: 210875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.15k £796 £1.53k £952 £1.19k
Total expenditure £1.62k £865 £1.01k £1.48k £203
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A