Accounts and annual returns THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 211014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window