Governance STROKE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 211015

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 14 January 1963: Standard registration
- 22 July 2015: Funds received from 295094 ACTION FOR DYSPHASIC ADULTS
- 26 November 2018: Funds received from 1099097 THE EXECUTION CHARITABLE TRUST
- 17 August 2021: Funds received from 1086956 ILKESTON STROKE CLUB
- 14 March 2022: Funds received from 292575 ROTARY CLUB OF ITCHEN VALLEY
- 12 July 2022: Funds received from 257972 IDA MORTLOCK SADLER TRUST
- 12 August 2022: Funds received from 1029794 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF LANGPORT AND SOMERTON BENEVOLE...
- 26 August 2022: Funds received from 1034844 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BANGOR BENEVOLENT FUND
- 28 November 2022: Funds received from 296231 MILTON KEYNES TALK BACK ASSOCIATION
- 19 December 2022: Funds received from 1038275 BRIDGNORTH OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE AND GOOD NEIGHBOUR...
- 23 February 2023: Funds received from 1065513 PORTCHESTER STROKE CLUB
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- THE STROKE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.