Trustees STROKE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 211015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN KING Chair 01 August 2017
None on record
Virginia McVea Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
Andrew Robert Archibald Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Stanley Trustee 30 June 2021
THE NORTHERN COLLEGE FOR RESIDENTIAL ADULT EDUCATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Ceri Jackson Trustee 08 October 2020
THE CARDIFF INSTITUTE FOR THE BLIND, INCORPORATED
Received: On time
Prof Avril Drummond Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Ian Macpherson Lee Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
DR David Buckle Trustee 24 September 2018
Berkshire Healthcare Charity
Received: On time
THE SOCIETY FOR RELIEF OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF MEDICAL MEN
Received: On time
Katherine Gillespie Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Harvinder Singh Rattan Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Eduardo Garcez Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Dr MARTIN ANTHONY JAMES Trustee 22 July 2014
None on record
PROFESSOR TOM ROBINSON Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Peter Anthony Troy MBE Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record