Accounts and annual returns THE KINGSDOWNE SOCIETY

Charity number: 211069
Charity is in administration
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 718 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Overdue by 718 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1083 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1083 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1448 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1448 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1814 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1814 days