Accounts and annual returns SWANSEA AND DISTRICT FRIENDS OF THE BLIND

Charity number: 211343
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 76 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2022 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 July 2021 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 July 2021 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 February 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 February 2020 17 days late Download Open in new window