Financial history SWANSEA AND DISTRICT FRIENDS OF THE BLIND

Charity number: 211343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.41k £28.54k £230.88k £2.19k £8.66k
Total expenditure £62.86k £50.84k £84.08k £55.55k £58.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A