Accounts and annual returns THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 211409
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 35 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 December 2022 396 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 December 2022 396 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window