VISION SUPPORT HARROGATE DISTRICT

Charity number: 211436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download