Financial history VISION SUPPORT HARROGATE DISTRICT

Charity number: 211436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £70.30k £83.59k £66.41k £62.75k £93.37k
Total expenditure £115.37k £116.95k £127.31k £124.54k £117.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.97k £2.04k £1.10k N/A £39.11k