Financial history FOLKESTONE MUNICIPAL CHARITY

Charity number: 211528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £118.10k £123.61k £130.32k £129.57k £124.46k
Total expenditure £98.46k £114.90k £112.91k £107.50k £106.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A