SELDEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 211536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

36 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROF JOHN HUDSON Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record
REVEREND PROFESSOR ANDREW LEWIS Trustee None on record
Dr Richard Bagley Trustee
THE ROGER COUNTER FOUNDATION Received: On time
LORD JUDGE Trustee
THE KALISHER TRUST Received: On time
PROF RICHARD HELMHOLZ Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
John Howell QC Trustee 12 July 2011 None on record
DR MIKE MACNAIR Trustee None on record
REVEREND PROFESSOR THOMAS WATKIN Trustee None on record
PROF WILFRID PREST Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
Dr ELIZABETH GOLDRING Trustee 07 July 2015
THE SUSANNE BEER CELLO CORNER FOUNDATION Recently registered
Dr SEAN CUNNINGHAM Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID IBBETSON Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record
Professor Joshua Tate Trustee 02 July 2018 None on record
ANTHONY TAUSSIG Trustee None on record
Professor CHANTAL STEBBINGS Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record
NICHOLAS PETER LE POIDEVIN Trustee
THE AMULL CHARITY Recently registered
C.B.L. CHARITY FUND Overdue by 31 days
PROFESSOR WILLIAM CORNISH QC FBA Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR CATHARINE MACMILLAN Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record
Professor PAUL BRAND FBA Trustee None on record
Professor Gwen Seabourne Trustee 09 July 2020 None on record
DAVID YALE QC FBA Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR GEORGE GARNETT Trustee 07 July 2015
THE GLADSTONE MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
PROFESSOR SIR JOHN BAKER QC FBA Chair None on record
THE HON MORRIS ARNOLD Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR JANET LOENGARD Trustee None on record
Dr IAN WILLIAMS Trustee 07 July 2015 None on record
His Honour Judge Donald Michael Cryan Trustee 25 July 2016 None on record
Dr DAVID CROOK Trustee 01 July 2013
THE PIPE ROLL SOCIETY Received: On time
LINCOLN RECORD SOCIETY Received: On time
PROFESSOR REBECCA PROBERT Trustee None on record
Dr NEIL JONES Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JOHN WARRENDER LOBBAN Trustee None on record
DR JOHN MADDICOTT FBA Trustee
THE PIPE ROLL SOCIETY Received: On time
Dr SUSANNE BRAND Trustee
VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
W D AINGER Trustee None on record
PROF CHARLES DONAHUE JR Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR JOSHUA GETZLER Trustee 07 July 2015
THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF ST HUGH'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time