THE POLLARD COTTAGES

Charity number: 211545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required