THE POLLARD COTTAGES

Charity number: 211545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.58k £3.11k £3.82k £4.05k £0
Total expenditure £3.04k £5.68k £1.91k £7.02k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A