WALSALL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 211551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required