Trustees FRIENDS WORLD COMMITTEE FOR CONSULTATION

Charity number: 211647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Charles Lamb Chair 15 April 2012
None on record
Kenya Caridad Casanova-Sales Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Peter Mula Shitemi Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Timothy Gee Trustee 11 January 2022
None on record
ADRIAN PENNARD GLAMORGAN Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Jonathan Christopher Fletcher Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Peter John Ullathorne Trustee 01 January 2021
WESTHILL ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
CADBURY BARN TRUST
Received: On time
Caroline Ethel Livermore Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
David Shiner Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
MICHAEL ECCLES Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Esther Mombo Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Thuli Mbete Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
Bainito Wamalwa Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
Myron Randy Guachalla Montano Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Robin Mohr Trustee 12 July 2011
None on record