Financial history POLLARD AND DICKSON TRUST

Charity number: 211762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £23.89k £26.94k £23.89k £17.76k £20.53k
Total expenditure £39.47k £32.63k £56.54k £52.81k £45.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A