EDWARD HARVIST (ALSO KNOWN AS THE HARVIST ESTATE)

Charity number: 211970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download