Trustees ST PANCRAS CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Charity number: 212006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Mark Bayley | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Rev LUCY CLARE WINKETT | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Sandra Anne Lesley Simoni | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Professor Dorothy Sherman Severin | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
The Very Reverend Andrew Tremlett | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Ivan Harry Sedgwick | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Duncan Michael Philip Lamont | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
REVD SIMON PAUL WALSH BA FRSA | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
JUDITH HELEN POWELL | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
DOROTHEA JOY HACKMAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.