THE MARIE CELESTE SAMARITAN SOCIETY OF THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL

Charity number: 212048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 July 2016 On time Download