THE MARIE CELESTE SAMARITAN SOCIETY OF THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL

Charity number: 212048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £398.73k £413.65k £575.68k £487.34k £489.94k
Total expenditure £382.18k £380.58k £383.79k £336.11k £376.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £36.73k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £538.95k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £280.47k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £43.25k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.28k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £64.45k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £40.46k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £60.07k N/A N/A