Financial history INSTITUTE OF CLAYWORKERS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 212300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.89k £4.14k £3.87k £3.99k £2.61k
Total expenditure £5.28k £6.19k £6.40k £5.76k £6.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A