Accounts and annual returns POOR'S ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 212413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2020 11 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2019 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2018 30 January 2019 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2017 16 April 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2017 Not Required