HERTFORD POOR'S ESTATE

Charity number: 212421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 10 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 23 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required