Financial history RSA (THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ARTS, MANUFACTURES AND COMMERCE)

Charity number: 212424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.20m £11.53m £12.12m £8.40m £10.38m
Total expenditure £11.47m £11.54m £13.21m £10.04m £11.25m
Income from government contracts £159.87k N/A N/A £39.63k £216.37k
Income from government grants £156.00k N/A £93.44k £219.73k £50.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.29m £5.54m £5.54m £5.80m £5.77m
Income - Other trading activities £2.74m £2.12m £3.08m £293.08k £2.09m
Income - Charitable activities £2.40m £3.13m £2.80m £1.45m £1.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £718.00k £671.00k £669.00k £634.11k £628.03k
Income - Other £54.00k £75.00k £33.00k £228.37k £0
Income - Legacies £40 £5.54m £0 £21.20k £18.88k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.36m £7.40m £8.79m £7.31m £7.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.12m £4.14m £4.41m £2.73m £3.65m
Expenditure - Governance £110.00k £278.00k £311.00k £262.94k £265.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £810.00k £300.00k £655.00k £373.11k £644.15k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0