Accounts and annual returns FORNHAM ALL SAINTS CEMETERY TRUST

Charity number: 212499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required