Financial history ARTISTS' GENERAL BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 212667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £1.02m £675.51k £610.64k £586.91k £601.54k
Total expenditure £691.94k £731.96k £743.39k £660.84k £582.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £494.79k £201.35k £138.64k £341.02k £420.05k
Income - Other trading activities £14.65k £11.14k £7.14k £4.55k £10.84k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £510.96k £463.02k £464.86k £241.35k £170.65k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £426.00k £125.63k £65.73k £277.03k £351.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £655.09k £677.81k £694.21k £619.26k £499.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.85k £54.15k £49.18k £41.57k £83.62k
Expenditure - Governance £32.87k £40.92k £30.76k £22.45k £21.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £30.62k £49.64k £44.60k £41.40k £79.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0